Multiplication Flashcards Preview

Math > Multiplication > Flashcards

Flashcards in Multiplication Deck (26):
0

Define a multiplication:

A multiplication is the process of adding the same number a number of times.
Ex:5x4=adding the number five to itself four times.

1

What are the two numbers in a multiplication called?

Two factors.

2

What is the result of a multiplication called?

The product.

3

What is the table of 2, from 1 to 10?

2x1=2
2x2=4
2x3=6
2x4=8
2x5=10
2x6=12
2x7=14
2x8=16
2x9=18
2x10=20

4

What is the table of 3,from 1 to 10?

3x1=3
3x2=6
3x3=9
3x4=12
3x5=15
3x6=18
3x7=21
3x8=24
3x9=27
3x10=30

5

What is the table of 4,from 1 to 10?

4x1=4
4x2=8
4x3=12
4x4=16
4x5=20
4x6=24
4x7=28
4x8=32
4x9=36
4x10=40

6

What is the table of 5, from 1 to 10?

5x1=5
5x2=10
5x3=15
5x4=20
5x5=25
5x6=30
5x7=35
5x8=40
5x9=45
5x10=50

7

What is the table of 6, from 1 to 10?

6x1=6
6x2=12
6x3=18
6x4=24
6x5=30
6x6=36
6x7=42
6x8=48
6x9=54
6x10=60

8

What is the table of 7, from 1 to 10?

7x1=7
7x2=14
7x3=21
7x4=28
7x5=35
7x6=42
7x7=49
7x8=56
7x9=63
7x10=70

9

What is the table of 8, from 1 to 10?

8x1=8
8x2=16
8x3=24
8x4=32
8x5=40
8x6=48
8x7=56
8x8=64
8x9=72
8x10=80

10

What is the table of 9, from 1 to 10?

9x1=9
9x2=18
9x3=27
9x4=36
9x5=45
9x6=54
9x7=63
9x8=72
9x9=81
9x10=90

11

What is the table for 10, from 1 to 10?

10x1=10
10x2=20
10x3=30
10x4=40
10x5=50
10x6=60
10x7=70
10x8=80
10x9=90
10x10=100

12

11x11=?

121

13

23x4=?

92

14

45x20=?

900

15

603x55=?

33 165

16

565x246=?

138 990

17

20x?=120

6

18

33x?=132

4

19

560x?=10 640

19

20

371x?=36 358

98

21

839x?=3 775 500

4500

22

When confronted with an operation with a multiplication and an addition/substraction(ex:25+5x4),which do you calculate first:
-the addition
-the substraction
-the multiplication

You must always calculate the multiplication first,EXCEPT if there is a parentheses around the addition/substraction.
Ex:25+5x4 Multiplication first =25+20=45
(25+5)x4 Addition first =30x4=120

23

90-5x6

90-30=60

24

170-(8+9)x10

170-17x10=170-170=0

25

35x(50x40)+(6x5)

35x2000-30=70 000-30=69 970